Straus, Sharon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3068
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH STRAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1992