Strauss, Bradley Howard (CPSO#: 51825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D 408
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6066
Fax: (416) 480-6174
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Strauss ( CPSO# 51825 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D408 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY HOWARD STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1988