Strauss, Hans Dietrich (CPSO#: 25847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 504
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-5533
Fax: (905) 820-6342
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hans Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Strauss ( CPSO# 25847 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 2N1
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Credit Valley Professional
Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-5533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS DIETRICH STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1978