Strauss, John Stuart (CPSO#: 65222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
1001 Queen St. W.
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34302
Fax: (416) 979-4685
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Strauss ( CPSO# 65222 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN STUART STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993