Strauss, Martin Howard (CPSO#: 33013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 730-0938
Fax: (416) 229-6162
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin H. Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Strauss ( CPSO# 33013 )

Business Address:
107 - 4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 730-0938

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN HOWARD STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1981