Strauss, Paul Leonard (CPSO#: 63976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B 1
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 622-5990
Fax: (519) 622-5567
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Strauss ( CPSO# 63976 )

Business Address:
B1 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N1R 7L7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LEONARD STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1993