Streda, Athena (CPSO#: 42379)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2012