Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Streutker, Catherine Joanne (CPSO#: 68169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 2363
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dynacare Health Solutions
115 Midair Court
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6T 5V1
Canada
Phone: 905-790-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Streutker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Streutker ( CPSO# 68169 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Pathology
Suite CC2-099
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE JOANNE STREUTKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STREUTKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999