Strickler, Ronald Clayton (CPSO#: 21345)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 1990