Strigler, Stephen (CPSO#: 58923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downtown Doctors
Suite 418
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: 416 929 1530
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Strigler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Strigler ( CPSO# 58923 )

Business Address:
Downtown Doctors
Suite 418
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 929-1530

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN STRIGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRIGLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.
The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Stephen Strigler on or about February 23, 2017 at the City of Toronto did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: June 26, 2017
Place of charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service