Stringer, David Alexander (CPSO#: 32885)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2011