Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stringer, David Glenn (CPSO#: 57205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-7454
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.G. Stringer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stringer ( CPSO# 57205 )

Business Address:
Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GLENN STRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRINGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1989