Strode, Kelly Katherine (CPSO#: 82429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
89 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 265-7477
Fax: (519) 265-6006
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Strode Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Strode ( CPSO# 82429 )

Business Address:
208-89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY KATHERINE STRODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRODE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010