Strong, Stuart James (CPSO#: 22280)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 Mar 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001