Strongitharm, Donna Lynn (CPSO#: 30487)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015