Strulovici, Strul (CPSO#: 16819)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Paris, 1936

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1958
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Dec 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1998