Strumas, Nick (CPSO#: 69227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Macedonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73594
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Strumas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Strumas ( CPSO# 69227 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
4E9 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICK STRUMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000