Stryuts, Svetlana (CPSO#: 98790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:St. Petersburg State Medical Academy, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Main street PO box 969
Brighton ON  K0K 1H0
Phone: 613-475-1555
Fax: 613-480-6584
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA STRYUTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRYUTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015