Strzalkowska, Bozena Anna (CPSO#: 58688)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1999