Stuart, James Ian (CPSO#: 86980)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014