Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stuparyk, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 67073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-2216
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Stuparyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stuparyk ( CPSO# 67073 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Emergency Department
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-2216

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL STUPARYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STUPARYK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1996