Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sturm, Esther Rinah Weil (CPSO#: 54049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3292 Bayview Avenue
Suite 301
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 222-2200
Fax: (416) 224-9880
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER RINAH WEIL STURM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STURM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1986