Sturman, Dubravka (CPSO#: 42281)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 31 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010