Styles, Scott Gregory (CPSO#: 74871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: 905-721-3278
Fax: 905-721-3277
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT GREGORY STYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STYLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004