Stys, Anna Marie (CPSO#: 53979)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2007