Stys, Dana Michelle (CPSO#: 100311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  10 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 20 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA MICHELLE STYS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STYS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. STYS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STYS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. STYS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. STYS is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. STYS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 10 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2017 to 10 Dec 2017
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017