Stys, Peter Kazimierz (CPSO#: 54201)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2007