Su, Didacus (CPSO#: 22515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Villa Marconi
1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0A6
Phone: (613) 727-6201
Fax: (613) 727-9352
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIDACUS SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970