Su, Jason Wen-Shyang (CPSO#: 70189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C/O Durham Sports Centres
1883 Kingston Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 1C9
Phone: (905) 428-9370
Fax: (905) 428-2396
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C/O SPC
2180 Highway 7, Unit 16
Vaughan ON  L4K 1W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 709-4772
Fax: (905) 709-9354
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

C/O York-Med Physiotherapy
250 Harding Boulevard, Suite #310
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 737-1928
Fax: (905) 737-6178
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2 Sheppard Ave E., # Suite 601
Toronto ON  M2N 5Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-7364
Fax: (416) 223-8048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Wen-Shyang Su Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Su ( CPSO# 70189 )

Business Address:
1883 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C9
Phone Number: (905) 428-9370

Business Address:
601 - 2 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 5Y7
Phone Number: (416) 223-7364

Business Address:
250 Harding Boulevard
Suite 310
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-1928

Business Address:
Unit 16
2180 Highway 7
Thornhill ON  L4K 1W6
Phone Number: (905) 709-4772

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON WEN-SHYANG SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998