Su, Michael Chung Tiing (CPSO#: 71912)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1997 to 14 Sep 1997
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 15 Sep 1997 to 13 Oct 1997
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 1997 to 12 Jan 1998
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 1998