Su, Winnie Shaw-Wen (CPSO#: 82166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erie County Medical Center
Suite 1152
462 Grider Street
Buffalo NY  14215
United States
Phone: (716) 898-4803

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINNIE SHAW-WEN SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2005 to 28 Feb 2005
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2007