Subbarao, Padmaja (CPSO#: 68168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Respiratory Medicine
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Room 4534 Gerrard Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 4168132196
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PADMAJA SUBBARAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBBARAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1998