Subramani, Yamini (CPSO#: 105289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E, London, ON
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 902-4715
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagappa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagappa ( CPSO# 101909)
Dr. Y. Subramani ( CPSO# 105289)

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 850-5598

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAMINI SUBRAMANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SUBRAMANI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SUBRAMANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SUBRAMANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SUBRAMANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SUBRAMANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SUBRAMANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 27 Feb 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2016 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018