Subramaniam, Tharani (CPSO#: 87586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Kursk State Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Subramaniam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Subramaniam ( CPSO# 87586 )

Business Address:
Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-3607

Business Address:
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-5444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THARANI SUBRAMANIAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBRAMANIAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009