Subramanian, Anandaraja (CPSO#: 87537)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Anandaraja, Subramanian (used until: 23 Apr 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2007 to 15 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009