Subramanian, Thangamani (CPSO#: 31821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Walk-in Clinic
179 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A3
Phone: (905) 777-9779
Fax: (905) 777-9550
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Barbora Pek 1309 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8S 1C5 Tel: 905-529-6560
Date Received: 04 Nov 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THANGAMANI SUBRAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBRAMANIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1980