Suciu, Cristina-Delia (CPSO#: 61787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5508
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA-DELIA SUCIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1993