Sudai, Tamar (CPSO#: 52910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: Bercusson, Tamar (used until: 01 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 216
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-4445
Fax: (416) 498-3114
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Sudai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sudai ( CPSO# 52910 )

Business Address:
216 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 468-4445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMAR SUDAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985