Sudbury, Mary Susan Frances (CPSO#: 56481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: Brochet, Mary Susan Frances (used until: 22 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Sudbury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sudbury ( CPSO# 56481 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY SUSAN FRANCES SUDBURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDBURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1985