Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sue, Donna (CPSO#: 61159)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2001