Sue-A-Quan, Errol Albert (CPSO#: 21524)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Sue-A-Quan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017