Sue-Chue-Lam, Jerry (CPSO#: 28934)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerry Sue-Chue-Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016