Sugamori, Mark Eisei (CPSO#: 60816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Group
Upper Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-7418
Fax: (519) 787-7421
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Sugamori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sugamori ( CPSO# 60816 )

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Group
Upper Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK EISEI SUGAMORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGAMORI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017