Sugar, Linda Marilyn (CPSO#: 30441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4120
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Sugar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sugar ( CPSO# 30441 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E422 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA MARILYN SUGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1978