Suggitt, Terry Elizabeth (CPSO#: 77060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terry Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200


Corporation Name: Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY ELIZABETH SUGGITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUGGITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2001 to 19 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002