Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Suh, Kathryn Nuala (CPSO#: 63738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18798
Fax: (613) 761-5260
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn Suh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Suh ( CPSO# 63738 )

Business Address:
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN NUALA SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1992