Suh, Young Sun (CPSO#: 58699)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017