Sujana Kumar, Shoba (CPSO#: 79098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Endocrine Program
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOBA SUJANA KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUJANA KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2008