Sukerman, Darren Jay (CPSO#: 88072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1243 Islington Avenue, Suite #802
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 354-2000
Fax: (416) 354-2434
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren J Sukerman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sukerman ( CPSO# 88072 )

Business Address:
333 Bay Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5M 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 926-2698

Business Address:
Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 621-9700

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN JAY SUKERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2014