Sukkar, Ghassan Abdulrahman Abdullah (CPSO#: 93186)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013